This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/18/2022 at 15:37:03 (UTC).

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANYvs.WILSON CASIANO BELMONT, G AND H COMMUNICATION INC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANYvs WILSON CASIANO BELMONT, G AND H COMMUNICATION INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

EMILIO DIAZ-FUENTES AAO

Defendants

WILSON CASIANO BELMONT

G AND H COMMUNICATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY LOTANE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Substitute service 1/21/22 11:12 am Harrisson Santos

Motion to Appoint for Service of Process

Motion to Appoint for Service of Process

Order Appointing

Order Appointing; Comments: process server

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: WILSON CASIANO BELMONT

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: WILSON CASIANO BELMONT AND G&H COMMUNICATION INC

Affidavit of Non Military Service & Proper Venue

Affidavit of Non Military Service & Proper Venue; Comments: WILSON CASIANO BELMONT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: NAME ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT DOES NOT MATCH RETURN OF SERVICE AND SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service & Proper Venue; Comments: WILSON CASIANO BELMONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: WILSON CASIANO BELMONT AND G&H COMMUNICATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: WILSON CASIANO BELMONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing; Comments: process server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appoint for Service of Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Substitute service 1/21/22 11:12 am Harrisson Santos(G&H COMMUNICATION INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Lotane and Associates, P.A; Amount: -320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R