Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/01/2019 at 15:37:56 (UTC).

STAND UP MRI DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 STAND UP MRI DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************07-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEATHER DEMBINSKY AKA

STAND UP MRI DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA

HEATHER DEMBINSKY AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

DENISE LUBLINER

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION scheduled for February 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. be cancelled.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING UNDERWRITING

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, DONNA MOCH

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION scheduled for February 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. be cancelled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING UNDERWRITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAND-UP MRI & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER PA A/A/O DEMETRIUS RIVERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENISE P LUBLINER, ESQ