This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/16/2019 at 15:49:29 (UTC).

SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS LLC vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************40-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS LLC

JOESEPH KIELBASA AKA

SMARTRIDE WINDSHIELD REPAIR DBA

JOSEPH KIELBASA AAO

CHWR LLC AAO

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation Invoking the Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulation Invoking the Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, PIONNE CORBIN

Request

Request; Comments: FOR DEPOSITIONS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Amended Statement of Claim

Amended Statement of Claim; Comments: SPRINGBOX COLLECTIONS, LLC

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Invoking the Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, PIONNE CORBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Comments: FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Statement of Claim; Comments: SPRINGBOX COLLECTIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Bruce H Kauffman; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less