This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/19/2019 at 15:45:23 (UTC).

SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH REHAB vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH REHAB filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH REHAB

RYAN MAHONEY AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD LANDAU

Defendant Attorney

ROBIN JACKSON-BERNHARDT

 

Court Documents

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories; Comments: SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC, HEALTH & REHAB

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC, HEALTH & REHAB

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC, HEALTH & REHAB

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories; Comments: SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC, HEALTH & REHAB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SPORTS CHIROPRACTIC, HEALTH & REHAB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Landau & Associates, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less