This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:28 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC vs. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************45-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

GOLDEN LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF ORLANDO IN

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTE

CHASE BANK USA NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN MEISELS

Defendant Attorney

CANDACE SOLIS

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

Notice of Action Issued

Notice of Action Issued; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS,BENEFICIARIES,

Complaint

Complaint

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice

Notice; Comments: of Defendant Nonparticipation with RFMP Program

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

Affidavit of Constructive Service

Affidavit of Constructive Service

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry; Comments: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS,BENEFICIARIES,

Form "A"

Form "A"

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: LAKE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF ORLANDO, INC.

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Action Issued; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Constructive Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Comments: of Defendant Nonparticipation with RFMP Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry; Comments: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS,BENEFICIARIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS,BENEFICIARIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Form "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Comments: OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: M GEVINSON; Amount: -935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 935.00

    Read MoreRead Less