This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/14/2022 at 15:48:20 (UTC).

SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES P.A vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************73-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES P.A

RHONDA ROSE AAO

CLOW CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE DBA

NOAH ROSE GUD

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HOAG

Defendant Attorney

SARAH TANYHILL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: to defendant

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: to defendant

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: and designation of email address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Wednesday, April 27, 2022

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Primary Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Discovery

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Primary Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Wednesday, April 27, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert David Hoag; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: and designation of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: to defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: to defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPACE COAST CORPORATE HEALTH SERVICES PA is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH TANYHILL