This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2022 at 22:27:45 (UTC).

SNIPE, YVONNE vs. VALDES TRANSPORTATION LLCet al.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 SNIPE, YVONNE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VALDES TRANSPORTATION LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YVONNE SNIPE

Defendants and Others

VALDES TRANSPORTATION LLC

AMAURY TIRADO

LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS LLC

ARGENIS ALFONSO

MODIVCARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC FKA

MOVIDCARE SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JON LAMBE

Defendant and Other Attorney

CHRISTOPHER HALL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Proposed Certificate of Disbursement to be Issued

Proposed Certificate of Disbursement to be Issued

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Answer and Cross Claim

Answer and Cross Claim

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Cross Claim Summons Issued

Cross Claim Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Claim Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: HALL, CHRISTOPHER IAN; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: HALL, CHRISTOPHER IAN; Amount: -395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Cross Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: LAMBE, JON L.; Amount: -40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jon Lambe; Amount: -440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Certificate of Disbursement to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Modivcare Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant