This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/07/2019 at 15:32:56 (UTC).

SMITH, JENNIFER vs. SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE LLCet al.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 SMITH, JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bob LeBlanc and Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************04-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bob LeBlanc

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER SMITH

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R HILL

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE, LLC

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE, LLC.

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: jury trial

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Notice

Notice; Comments: of disclosure

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Comments: of disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, SEBASTIAN MOVING AND MORE, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: HILL, R JEREMY; Amount: -20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Luzardo Pendas; Amount: -400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less