This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:55:28 (UTC).

SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************04-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMONMED IMAGING FLORIDA LLC

BRYAN BARCLAY AAO

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN OWENS

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Complaint - USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Letter

Letter

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Complaint - USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less