This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/14/2022 at 16:15:48 (UTC).

SIGNATURE SHIELD INCvs.STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 SIGNATURE SHIELD INCvs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************28-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIGNATURE SHIELD INC AAO MICHAEL LUMPKIN

SIGNATURE SHIELD INC

MICHAEL LUMPKIN AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IMRAN MALIK

JOHN LAGROW

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGNATURE SHIELD INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN LAGROW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malik, Imran E