This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/12/2022 at 15:36:38 (UTC).

SEGOVIA, SHAKERIA vs. KB HOME et al.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 SEGOVIA, SHAKERIA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************73-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAKERIA SEGOVIA

Defendants

KB HOME

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiff

KB HOME ORLANDO, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

A&B STUCCO, INC.

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIL O'BRIEN

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

DANA CHAABAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served kb home 9/23/22

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served kb home florida 9/23/22

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served kb home orlando 9/23/22

Third Party Complaint

Third Party Complaint

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Dana Chaaban; Amount: -415.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 415.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: served kb home orlando 9/23/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: served kb home florida 9/23/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: served kb home 9/23/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Neil O'Brien; Amount: -430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Coating Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where A&B Stucco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where KB HOME ORLANDO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KB HOME is a litigant