This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/16/2021 at 16:38:19 (UTC).

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK vs. MAJORS, TIMOTHY FRASERet al.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MAJORS, TIMOTHY FRASER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald A Myers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Donald A Myers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

TIMOTHY FRASER MAJORS

SAPNA R MAJORS

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

S AND S BUSINESS VENTURES LLC

PARADISE BANK

CITY OF WINTER PARK

CITY OF ORLANDO

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUSTON SHORT

Defendant Attorney

LISA PEARSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON PARADISE BANK

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: CITY OF WINTER PARK

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: CITY OF ORLANDO

Answer

Answer; Comments: CITY OF ORLANDO

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: OF SUMMONS PARADISE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON PARADISE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: CITY OF WINTER PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: CITY OF ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: CITY OF ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gunster Yoakley and Stewart PA; Amount: -2005.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 2005.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADISE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic National Title Insurance Company is a litigant