This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/30/2021 at 15:31:31 (UTC).

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK vs. HUNTER VISION MANAGEMENT LLCet al.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUNTER VISION MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************99-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

FIRST GREEN BANK AST

Defendants

HUNTER VISION MANAGEMENT LLC

JOSHUA J HUNTER

JOEL D HUNTER

JOEL D., DR. HUNTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: Hunter Vision Management, LLC

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: Joshua J. Hunter

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: the returns of service, attached hereto as Exhibit A, showing service effectuated on Dr. Joel D. Hunter on November 4, 2021

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: the returns of service, attached hereto as Exhibit A, showing service effectuated on Dr. Joel D. Hunter on November 4, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: Joshua J. Hunter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: Hunter Vision Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: John A Anthony; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY, JOHN