This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/27/2019 at 15:35:51 (UTC).

SDPS INC vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/29/2018 SDPS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************76-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARGARITA CONTRERAS AAO

SDPS INC

RAFAEL CONTRERAS AAO

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARL HIGGS

Defendant Attorney

TENIA HUNTER

 

Court Documents

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability; Comments: commencing February 21, 2019 through April 4, 2019.

Waiver

Waiver; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and desigantion of email address

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: discovery served with complaint

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability; Comments: commencing February 21, 2019 through April 4, 2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and desigantion of email address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: discovery served with complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Earl Higgs; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less