This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 23:38:39 (UTC).

SCOTT, SHANNONvs.UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 SCOTT, SHANNONvs UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON SCOTT

Defendants

UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD

LOMBARDS SEAFOOD GRILLE DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNETH MCKENNA

Defendant Attorney

BIANCA LISTON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kenneth J McKenna; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less