This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/19/2022 at 15:38:09 (UTC).

SCANLON, WILDENvs.HOME DEPOT USA INC et al.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 SCANLON, WILDENvs HOME DEPOT USA INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************99-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDEN SCANLON

Defendants

HOME DEPOT USA INC

M C DEAN INC

ROGER ELECTRIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER KOBYLINSKI

Defendant Attorney

YVETTE PACE

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.C. Dean, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YVETTE PACE