This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2022 at 19:25:49 (UTC).

SANDY REALTY INCvs.BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 SANDY REALTY INCvs BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************85-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDY REALTY INC

Defendant

BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL DE LIGUORI

Defendant Attorney

MELISSA ESCOFFERY

 

Court Documents

Letter

Letter

Correspondence

Correspondence

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Response

Response; Comments: to defendant's motion to dismiss

Letter

Letter

Correspondence

Correspondence

Response

Response; Comments: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: Thursday, February 10, 2022, at 10:00 a.m.

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CLAIM OF LIEN AND TO DISCHARGE BY CANCELLATION OR ALTERNATIVE INCORPORATED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Complaint

Complaint

Summons to Show Cause

Summons to Show Cause; Comments: BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingHearing: Motion - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim); Location: Hearing Room 1700.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingHearing: Motion - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: to defendant's motion to dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: THE IVANOR LAW FIRM; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to Show Cause; Comments: BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL DE LIGUORI