This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/09/2021 at 13:31:26 (UTC).

SANDS, MARLEN Jvs.AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 SANDS, MARLEN Jvs AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa T. Munyon and Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************87-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lisa T. Munyon

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARLEN J SANDS

MARK J SANDS AKA

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEREDITH TRUEN

CANDACE CULZAC

Defendant Attorney

PETER DIAMOND

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter; Comments: Re: Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY REQUESTS - Plaintiff, MARLEN J. SANDS

Objection

Objection; Comments: DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF FILING ITS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; Comments: the Defendant, Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comments: on defendant's objections to plaintiff's notice of taking deposition duces tecum of field adjuster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: VIDEO TAPED DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Harold Levy; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Peter Alexander