This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2019 at 15:34:31 (UTC).

SANDROYAN, VICTORIA et al.vs.HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC et al.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 SANDROYAN, VICTORIA filed an Other lawsuit against HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Jose R Rodriguez and Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Jose R Rodriguez

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VICTORIA SANDROYAN

GEVORK ARUTYUNYAN

Defendants

HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC

CELEBRATION MANIA INVESTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID SINGER

Defendant Attorneys

KATHERINE WOODS

KENNETH RUGH

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Harbco General Contractors Inc

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Celebration Mania Investors LLC

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, CELEBRATION MANIA INVESTORS, LLC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, CELEBRATION MANIA INVESTORS, LLC

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-SERVICE ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Harbco General Contractors Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Celebration Mania Investors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-SERVICE ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, CELEBRATION MANIA INVESTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, HARBCO GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, CELEBRATION MANIA INVESTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Nina Jo Walters D W Singer PA; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less