This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/11/2022 at 15:52:12 (UTC).

SANDRA MONICA GOMEZ, ELIS DANIEL VOLCAN RODRIGUEZvs.SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 SANDRA MONICA GOMEZ, ELIS DANIEL VOLCAN RODRIGUEZvs SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDRA MONICA GOMEZ

ELIS DANIEL VOLCAN RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE MIRANDA

Defendant Attorney

CHANCEY SMITH

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Monday, September 19, 2022 - SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Order Granting

Order Granting; Comments: Defts Demand for Apprasial

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting; Comments: Defts Demand for Apprasial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Monday, September 19, 2022 - SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Michelle Miranda; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant