Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 07/01/2021 at 17:11:41 (UTC).

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANYvs.EDY MORALES SANTIZO

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANYvs EDY MORALES SANTIZO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

EDY MORALES SANTIZO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL UDINE

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear Returned Unserved

Notice to Appear Returned Unserved

Complaint

Complaint

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: Edy Morales Santizo

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum needs to be Submitted. Please correct and resubmit the entire filing within 5 business days. days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: UDINE, MICHAEL IRA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: Edy Morales Santizo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Udine, Michael I, ESQ.