This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/11/2019 at 03:49:05 (UTC).

SAENZ RODRIGUEZ, KEILA vs. FLECHA, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 SAENZ RODRIGUEZ, KEILA filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FLECHA, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Alice L Blackwell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Alice L Blackwell

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEILA SAENZ RODRIGUEZ

Respondent

WILLIAM FLECHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Final Order Permanent Injunction Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Final Order of Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Petition or Motion for Modification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • HEARING - Injunctions - Blackwell, Alice L (Actual: Blackwell, Alice L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Temporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Request for Confidential Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less