This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:57:16 (UTC).

SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SACOWI MEDICAL CLINIC DBA

KAITLYN SWIERZKO AAO

SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

BRANDON ETTELMAN

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

Addendum to

Addendum to

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: chad barr

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: chad barr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less