This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 01:23:04 (UTC).

SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC vs. LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************77-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS

SACOWI MEDICAL CONSULTANTS, INC

SACOWI MEDICAL CLINIC DBA

ERICKA ASHE-LANE AAO

Defendant

LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: (Defts) to Respond to the Complaint

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: (Defts) to Respond to Discovery

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Letter

Letter; Comments: Re: Deposition

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: (First)

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (First)

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: (Defts) to Respond to the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: (Defts) to Respond to Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less