Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 15:36:39 (UTC).

S2 ANDOVER LLCvs.TARASHEKA DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 S2 ANDOVER LLCvs TARASHEKA DAVIS was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************72-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S2 ANDOVER LLC

THE LORENZO AT EAST MIL DBA

Defendant

TARASHEKA DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Aside Judgment

Order Setting Aside Judgment; Comments: & Entry of Order Adopting Stip & Dismiss Case

Motion to Set Aside Judgment

Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Comments: AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AND ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND DISMISS CASE

Stipulation

Stipulation

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted

Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment

Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment; Comments: for possession

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Setting Aside/Vacating

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside Judgment; Comments: & Entry of Order Adopting Stip & Dismiss Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside Judgment; Comments: AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AND ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment; Comments: for possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: JAMES I BARRON III P.A.; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON