This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:54 (UTC).

ROY BENEFIELD vs. CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 ROY BENEFIELD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROY BENEFIELD

Defendant

CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC DEMING

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW BERNSTEIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: OF CORRESPONDENCE TO THE DEFENDANT

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: WILLIAM SUNDBERG

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF ROY BENEFIELD,

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Privilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF ROY BENEFIELD,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service; Comments: OF CORRESPONDENCE TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Eric Deming; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less