This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:50:38 (UTC).

ROSCOE, JOHN W vs. ROSCOE, LINDA L

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 ROSCOE, JOHN W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROSCOE, LINDA L. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark S Blechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mark S Blechman

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOHN W ROSSCOE

JOHN W ROSCOE

Respondent

LINDA L ROSCOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOHN KENNY

Respondent Attorney

ALAN LANDMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer Denying Allegations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAcceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: John C. Kenny; Amount: -418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less