This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/11/2021 at 21:27:12 (UTC).

ROMAN, AWILDA vs. LOPEZ, MIGUEL ANGEL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 ROMAN, AWILDA filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against LOPEZ, MIGUEL ANGEL. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************20-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AWILDA ROMAN

Respondent

MIGUEL ANGEL LOPEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDemographic Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDemographic Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder for Income Deduction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Proceeding to Establish Administrative Support Ord

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDemographic Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDemographic Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less