This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/08/2023 at 15:03:57 (UTC).

ROLLING HILLS 5402 HOLDINGS LLC, ML ROLLING HILLS LLC, MADISON ROLLING HILLS LLCvs.CHAUN'JEANETTA DILTZ

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 ROLLING HILLS 5402 HOLDINGS LLC, ML ROLLING HILLS LLC, MADISON ROLLING HILLS LLCvs CHAUN'JEANETTA DILTZ was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************07-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROLLING HILLS 5402 HOLDINGS LLC

ML ROLLING HILLS LLC

MADISON ROLLING HILLS LLC

Defendant

CHAUN'JEANETTA DILTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFERY WILKINS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Emailed Atty

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

 

Docket Entries

12/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketReturned Mail

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: Emailed Atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WILKINS, JEFFERY MERRELL; Amount: -195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less