Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/02/2021 at 02:41:28 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, JAIME vs. WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANYet al.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 RODRIGUEZ, JAIME filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa T. Munyon and Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************69-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lisa T. Munyon

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIME RODRIGUEZ

Defendants

MARCELO FERNANDO SOTO

FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION INC

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLOS DIEZ-ARGUELLES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: as to Florida Insurance Guaranty Association Inc

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION INC

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atttorney.

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ? Negligence other

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: as to Florida Insurance Guaranty Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atttorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Summons Not Issued - Defendant's name on the summons does not match the name on the complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Carlos Diez-Arguelles; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA INS. GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diez-Arguelles, Carlos R