This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/17/2022 at 10:11:29 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, ASHLEY vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 RODRIGUEZ, ASHLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADY GOSS

RYAN RUDD

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW GORMAN

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Mediation

Notice of Mediation; Comments: April 14, 2022, at 1:30 P.M

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter

Notice of Withdrawal

Notice of Withdrawal; Comments: OF WAGES LOSS CLAIM

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: October 18, 2021 at 8:30 a.m

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO DEFENDANT S NOTICES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation; Comments: April 14, 2022, at 1:30 P.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Comments: OF WAGES LOSS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: THE MORGAN LAW FIRM PA DBA MORGAN AND MORGAN; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: and Demand for Jury Trial , Count I, Count II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN RUDD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADY GOSS