This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/05/2019 at 15:33:30 (UTC).

RILEY, TERA vs. RILEY, RONALD Eet al.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 RILEY, TERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RILEY, RONALD E. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bob LeBlanc and Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bob LeBlanc

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERA RILEY

Defendants

BONNIE LOU RILEY

RONALD E RILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIP MOELLER

Defendant Attorney

DAVID BLESSING

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RONALD E RILEY

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, BONNIE LOU RILEY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO BONNIE LOU RILEY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, BONNIE LOU RILEY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RONALD E RILEY

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, BONNIE LOU RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO BONNIE LOU RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO RONALD E RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, BONNIE LOU RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RONALD E RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Harvey V. Cohen; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less