This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/09/2021 at 21:26:11 (UTC).

RICHBERG, SOLOMONet al. vs. MCCAHILL, JESSE CARLet al.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 RICHBERG, SOLOMON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCCAHILL, JESSE CARL. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa T. Munyon and Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lisa T. Munyon

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLOMON RICHBERG

DAPHNEE PHILLIPPE

Defendants

TIMOTHY ALLEN BEHM

AARON JOSEPH KRAUSE

MCCAHILL CONTRACTORS

JESSE CARL MCCAHILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASHEED ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

CLINTON MCCAHILL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Cancellation of Hearing

Notice Cancellation of Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendants, MCCAHILL CONTRACTING, INC. and JESSE CARL MCCAHILL

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: AGAINST MCCAHILL CONTRACTORS

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: AGAINST JESSE MCCAHILL

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: as to Jesse Carl McCahill

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: as to Aaron Joseph Krause

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: 7/28/2020 8:30

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw; Comments: ROBERT B. WORMAN S/WORMAN & SHEFFLER, P.A. S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS, TIMOTHY ALLEN BEHM AND AARON JOSEPH KRAUSE

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT MCCAHILL CONTRACTORS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Cancellation of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendants, MCCAHILL CONTRACTING, INC. and JESSE CARL MCCAHILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: 12/02/2020 at 8:30 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: AGAINST MCCAHILL CONTRACTORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: AGAINST JESSE MCCAHILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Munyon, Lisa T. (Actual: Munyon, Lisa T.); Location: Document Icon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Rasheed Allen; Amount: -440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT MCCAHILL CONTRACTORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINTON MCCAHILL