This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/12/2022 at 16:01:58 (UTC).

RESURGENT RECEIVABLES LLCvs.PETER GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 RESURGENT RECEIVABLES LLCvs PETER GONZALEZ was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************36-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESURGENT RECEIVABLES LLC

Defendant

PETER GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAROLD SCHERR

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Harold Earl Scherr; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ