This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:08:32 (UTC).

RESULTS CHIROPRACTIC, INC. vs. ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 RESULTS CHIROPRACTIC, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RESULTS CHIROPRACTIC

RESULTS CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

CHRISNEL LOUIS AAO

Defendant

ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

HENRY RAMOS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Letter

Letter; Comments: Re: Deposition

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: (First)

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (First)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less