This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/11/2023 at 16:05:30 (UTC).

RESTORATION FIRST SERVICE CORP vs.AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 RESTORATION FIRST SERVICE CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************97-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RESTORATION FIRST SERVICE CORP

GLORIA PORCHE AAO

Defendant

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRINGTON JONES

Defendant Attorney

ALAINE GREENBERG

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service

Notice of Service

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Pltfs Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Pltfs Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: The Law Office of Carrington Jones; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less