This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/10/2018 at 15:41:30 (UTC).

RENE AGUILERA vs. CELESTE SAWYER

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 RENE AGUILERA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CELESTE SAWYER. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha C Adams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************59-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Martha C Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENE AGUILERA

Defendant

CELESTE SAWYER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESIREE SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: org & copy to pltf atty

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: THURSDAY NOVERMBER 29, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M.

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: against Celeste Sawyer

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Celeste Sawyer

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: amended

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: AMENDED COMPLAINT

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: CELESTE SAWYER

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint; Comments: FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: org & copy to pltf atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing; Comments: THURSDAY NOVERMBER 29, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Comments: against Celeste Sawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Celeste Sawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: SANCHEZ, DESIREE; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Desiree Sanchez; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DESIREE SANCHEZ