This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/09/2023 at 20:38:38 (UTC).

REJUVINEX MEDICAL CENTER LLC vs. MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 REJUVINEX MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************48-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REJUVINEX MEDICAL CENTER LLC

JESSICA GUTIERREZ AAO

REJUVINEX MEDICAL KISSIMMEE DBA

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISSA GILBERT-KEANE

Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN SEEKAMP

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: (Partial) on the Issue of Standing

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: in Issue of the Pre Suit Demand Letter

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Adjuster Code of Ethics (Attached)

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: 2021 PIP Statute (ATTACHED)

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Proof of Service of Process (Attached)

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: (Partial) on the Issue of Standing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: in Issue of the Pre Suit Demand Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Adjuster Code of Ethics (Attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: 2021 PIP Statute (ATTACHED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Proof of Service of Process (Attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less