This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/14/2019 at 15:40:28 (UTC).

REJNIAK, GABRIELLEet al. vs. OKORO MD, CHINWE NNEKAet al.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 REJNIAK, GABRIELLE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against OKORO MD, CHINWE NNEKA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bob LeBlanc and Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bob LeBlanc

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABRIELLE REJNIAK

TOMASZ REJNIAK

AINSLEY REJNIAK GUD

Defendants

FLORIDA HOSPITAL DBA

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMS/SUNBELT INC

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC

LT MEDICAL LLC

CHINWE NNEKA OKORO MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HECTOR MORE'

Defendant Attorneys

PATRICK TELAN

CHRISTOPHER SCHULTE

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: counts III and IV of plaintiffs' complaint defendant adventist health system/sunbelt inc dba florida hospital

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Comments: counts III and IV of plaintiffs' complaint defendant adventist health system/sunbelt inc dba florida hospital

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: the Morgan Firm, PA d/b/a Morgan & Morgan; Amount: -440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 440.00

    Read MoreRead Less