This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/06/2023 at 10:55:15 (UTC).

REIDER, STEVEN J et al. vs. CALATLANTIC GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 REIDER, STEVEN J filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CALATLANTIC GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVEN J REIDER

BARBARA A REIDER

Defendants

CALATLANTIC GROUP LLC

CALATLANTIC GROUP INC SBM

THE RYLAND GROUP INC SBM

CONVERSION OF CALATLANTIC GROUP INC SI

3Rd Party Plaintiffs

CALATLANTIC GROUP, LLC

CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC. SBM

THE RYLAND GROUP, INC SBM

CONVERSION OF CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC SI

3Rd Party Defendants

A & B STUCCO, INC.

DALEMKA COATINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIL O'BRIEN

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

DANA CHAABAN

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

MOHAMED SOMJI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: served a&b stucco inc 11/1/22

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: OF DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: OF DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET

Third Party Complaint

Third Party Complaint

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: on Calatlantic Group LLC

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: served a&b stucco inc 11/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Summons Issued; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: OF DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: on Calatlantic Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Neil O'Brien; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less