This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2022 at 07:57:02 (UTC).

REI SIDING LLC vs. BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 REI SIDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************66-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REI SIDING LLC

Defendant

BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALBERT SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVIE OF FL, INC

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

Motion and Entry of Clerk Default; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Letter

Letter

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: DEFAULT

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: cancelling lien

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: REI SIDING LLC; Amount: -7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: cancelling lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion and Entry of Clerk Default; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVIE OF FL, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Albert Sanchez; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACK HORSE CONSTRUCTION SERVICE OF FL INC is a litigant