This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/22/2022 at 08:26:27 (UTC).

RE: Estate of KEVIN MAW Deceased

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 RE Estate of KEVIN MAW Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Alice L Blackwell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Alice L Blackwell

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SARAH MAW

Decedent

KEVIN MAW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ERNEST MYERS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketClaim Signed by Clerk & Mailed; Comments: atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Roxford Anderson $6,340.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Denying

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder; Comments: for Access to Digital Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder Denying Petition for Summary Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketClaim Signed by Clerk & Mailed; Comments: ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: American Express National Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketChecklist for Summary Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketJoinder; Comments: Waiver and Consent Brooke Maw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketJoinder; Comments: Waiver and Consent Richard Maw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marcus Myers PA; Amount: -345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketApplication; Comments: for Access to Digital Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Comments: DOD 07/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration Over $1000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less