Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/10/2021 at 21:27:50 (UTC).

RE: Estate of GLORIA J HARPER Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 RE Estate of GLORIA J HARPER Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet C Thorpe and Lisa T. Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Janet C Thorpe

Lisa T. Munyon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIONNE FALCONER

Decedent

GLORIA J HARPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EVAN GLASSER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketClaim Signed by Clerk & Mailed; Comments: atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Inpatient Consultants of Michigan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotification of Rejection of Confidential Filing Request; Comments: E-Mailed to Atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gerald Greenspoon; Amount: -345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Comments: JOSEPH LEE HARPER JR- DOD 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Comments: GLORIA JAN HARPER- DOD 3/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketFuneral Bill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketJoinder; Comments: WAIVER AND CONSENT- MICHELLE BALLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketJoinder; Comments: WAIVER AND CONSENT- DIONNE FALCONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketJoinder; Comments: WAIVER AND CONSENT- JOSEPH C HARPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketJoinder; Comments: WAIVER AND CONSENT- EBONI ADENIYI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration Over $1000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Glasser