Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/14/2021 at 19:32:29 (UTC).

RE: Estate of BRADLEY PAUL BREWER, SR Deceased

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 RE Estate of BRADLEY PAUL BREWER, SR Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T. Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T. Munyon

 

Party Details

Decedent

BRADLEY PAUL BREWER SR

Not Classified By Court

KENNA RAE MILLEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ROBERT HINES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Comments: DOD 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: HINES, ROBERT D.; Amount: -400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Comments: DOD 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Priority, Consent to Appointment, Waiver of Bond; Comments: Tori M Brewer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Priority, Consent to Appointment, Waiver of Bond; Comments: Carli Brewer Soukup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: of Heirs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOath of PR, Designation of Resident Agent & Acceptance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT HINES