This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/19/2022 at 16:00:22 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS vs.MGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 RAPID AUTO GLASS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS

JAMES CALLOWAY AAO

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY KELLER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Letter

Letter; Comments: LETTER

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: MGA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Quattrochi and Torres PA; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MGA Insurance Company Inc is a litigant