This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/21/2022 at 16:00:35 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

HEATHER JONES AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Amended Answer

Amended Answer

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: Appearance of Corporate Representative & Alternative Motion to Strike

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY - Electronic Delivery - October 18th, 2022

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Correspondence

Correspondence

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: Appearance of Corporate Representative & Alternative Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY - Electronic Delivery - October 18th, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant