This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/21/2022 at 16:00:27 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************52-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

NANCY NILES AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Service of Process & Original Summons

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Service of Process & Original Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad A. Barr; Amount: -320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant