This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/16/2022 at 16:23:11 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

DOMONIQUE BROWN AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

ELISA MORALES

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Response

Response; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'SMOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNITIVELY, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Objection

Objection; Comments: to plaintiffs request for admissions

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY, AND COMPEL APPRAISAL, AND RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS (NO ATTACHMENT)

Correspondence

Correspondence

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'SMOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNITIVELY, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: to plaintiffs request for admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY, AND COMPEL APPRAISAL, AND RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS (NO ATTACHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant