Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/28/2019 at 15:44:48 (UTC).

QUICKLINK CLAIMS LLC vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 QUICKLINK CLAIMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFREY NODLAND AKA

QUICKLINK CLAIMS LLC

Defendants

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM KEBLER

 

Court Documents

Stipulation

Stipulation

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Stipulation Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Imran Ebrahim Malik; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUICKLINK CLAIMS AAO FLORIDA STATE AUTO GLASS AAO is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant