Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/28/2019 at 15:47:15 (UTC).

QUALCARE MEDICAL GROUP LLC vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 QUALCARE MEDICAL GROUP LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Martha C Adams and Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************79-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Martha C Adams

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUALCARE MEDICAL GROUP LLC

JOSE RIVERO AKA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CINDY GOLDSTEIN

Defendant Attorney

BRIDGET BULLIS

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: BINDING AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: OF CO-COUNSEL

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: HEARING NOT CANCELED NOTICE NOT FILED IN TIME

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: BY QUALCARE MEDICAL GROUP LLC

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: BINDING AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: OF CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: HEARING NOT CANCELED NOTICE NOT FILED IN TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: BY QUALCARE MEDICAL GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Cindy A. Goldstein, PA; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Qualcare Medical Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Goldstein, Cindy A